NIGHTWATCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Nightwatch provides food, clothing and resettlement goods to homeless and otherwise very poor and vulnerable people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
Governance
- 31 January 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR JAD ADAMS MA FRHISTS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Fiona Satiro | Trustee | 16 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Nana Nketiaa Aquah | Trustee | 16 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Louise Edwards | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROGER DAVIES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.34k | £132.79k | £66.17k | £82.44k | £99.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.15k | £118.66k | £89.69k | £91.22k | £100.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 2ND SEPTEMBER 1977, AS AMENDED 11TH JUNE 2003
Charitable objects
CARE AND TREATMENT OF PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE HOMELESS ROOTLESS OR OTHERWISE THROUGH ADVERSE CIRCUMSTANCES ARE IN NEED OF HELP IN ACQUIRING A SETTLED WAY OF LIFE. ESTABLISHING HOSTELS AND ASSOCIATING WITH OTHER GROUPS IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 9576
London
SE23 3ZH
- Phone:
- 02086996718
- Email:
- roger_davies@talktalk.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window