L'OUVERTURE TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LOuverture provides arts and media activities for children and young people which aim to help them to overcome barriers and achieve their potential. We present a world of inspiration, energy, excitement and creativity giving young people opportunities for personal, professional and social development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 08 November 1978: Standard registration
- 10 January 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- L'OUVERTURE THEATRE TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 30/04/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £368.13k | £471.32k | £386.29k | £344.18k | £204.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £507.80k | £472.93k | £399.69k | £595.44k | £216.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2009 | 05 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2009 | 12 August 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 09 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 16 December 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 19 February 2008 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 04 February 2008 | 4 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 08 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 20 December 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 NOVEMBER 1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 5 SEPTEMBER 1978 AND 1 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF THE ARTS AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS; AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE INHABITANTS CONCERNING GOOD CITIZENSHIP IN A MULTIRACIAL SOCIETY AND THE INTELLECTUAL, ARTISTIC, ECONOMIC AND CULTURAL BACKGROUND OF THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF WESTMINSTER AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window