Trustees THE HINTLESHAM AND CHATTISHAM COMMUNITY COUNCIL
Charity number: 274948

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert John Smith | Chair | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Francis Knuckey | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Alexandra De Banks | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Bernard Lee | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Edward Hammond | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hayden Wilding | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cristiana Paranhos Velloso Langton | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Archer | Trustee | 16 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN DAMANT | Trustee | 15 March 1983 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.