DOLPHINS RECREATION CENTRE

Charity number: 274956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Running the Hall and Recreation Ground

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £59,507
Total expenditure: £197,736

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 February 1978: Standard registration
  • 11 July 2018: Funds received from 301633 TETBURY MEMORIAL RECREATION GROUND AND DOLPHINS HA...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN DAVID SCOTT Chair 20 November 2015
DOLPHINS RECREATION CENTRE
Received: On time
TETBURY AREA YOUTH & COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
Alexander Ball Trustee 04 June 2019
None on record
Jamie Ponting Trustee 26 April 2018
TETBURY CRICKET CLUB LIMITED
Received: On time
DOLPHINS RECREATION CENTRE
Received: On time
Paul Jones Trustee 26 April 2018
DOLPHINS RECREATION CENTRE
Received: On time
DAVID HOBSON Trustee 21 April 2015
DOLPHINS RECREATION CENTRE
Received: On time
PATRICIA BURRELL Trustee 16 May 2012
DOLPHINS RECREATION CENTRE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £46.03k £53.07k £320.93k £340.38k £59.51k
Total expenditure £79.10k £107.58k £296.91k £297.70k £197.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.48k £20.60k £10.67k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 07 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 February 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 August 2023 183 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Dolphins Hall
New Church Street
TETBURY
Gloucestershire
GL8 8DS
Phone:
07739909047
Website:

dolphinshall.org