BERKHAMSTED MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Society are the presentation of concerts of professional standard, lectures on music and other activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 01 March 1978: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUMPHREY THOMAS NORRINGTON | Chair | 01 June 2008 |
|
|||||
Bob Hattersley | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthea Lovatt | Trustee | 06 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Guy St John Dawkins | Trustee | 18 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
COLIN HENRY MITCHELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr IAN ANDREW FYFE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR NEIL KENNEDY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.17k | £3.44k | £13.91k | £22.87k | £24.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.56k | £5.97k | £16.13k | £21.95k | £21.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 MAY 1977 as amended on 20 Jun 2008
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, IN THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS OF PROFESSIONAL STANDARD, LECTURES ON MUSIC AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 HALL PARK GATE
BERKHAMSTED
HP4 2NL
- Phone:
- 01442862798
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window