HEADCORN VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE VILLAGE HALL IS FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF HEADCORN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £26,124 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 23 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Charles Thomas | Chair | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Vincent | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARGERY JOY LARKINS | Trustee | 13 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANN HOLMES | Trustee | 13 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM DAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.25k | £48.92k | £62.39k | £317.85k | £139.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.04k | £37.82k | £52.71k | £126.80k | £120.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.00k | £28.50k | £4.00k | N/A | £26.12k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 30TH NOVEMBER 1964 AND AMENDED 27TH SEPTEMBER 1977 (AS AFFECTED BY A UNITING DIRECTION MADE 23 SEPTEMBER 2008)
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF HEADCORN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
HEADCORN AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Linked charities
- 23 September 2008 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church Lane
Headcorn
Kent
TN27 9NR
- Phone:
- 07944 668802
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window