Financial history EARLS BARTON YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 275007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.29k £13.98k £15.35k £14.09k £12.28k
Total expenditure £16.97k £12.85k £9.11k £9.88k £28.33k
Income from government contracts £600 N/A £300 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.30k £11.30k £1.30k £1.30k £1.30k