DENNINGTON JUBILEE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Use of the Village Hall by the inhabitants of the Parish including meetings, lectures, classes, indoor sports and, for other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of improving the social and general life of the inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £190 from 1 government contract(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 04 November 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frances Mary Andrews | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Pardey | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Rust | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Turner | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roy Steward | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Roy Steward | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Viscardi | Trustee | 23 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Miles Vasey Thomas | Trustee | 23 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Denton | Trustee | 23 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MABERLY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT ROUS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNY DYNE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.46k | £24.06k | £26.68k | £22.58k | £24.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.92k | £10.72k | £16.33k | £16.45k | £24.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £190 | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k | £20.91k | £10.67k | £510 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 6TH APRIL 1983
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF DENNINGTON IN THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK WHITHOUTDISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR FUNCTIONS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS FO RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF DENNINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Spring Farm House
The Street
Dennington
WOODBRIDGE
Suffolk
IP13 8JF
- Phone:
- 07979 600442
- Website:
-
denningtonvillagehall.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window