THE ASSOCIATION FOR LATIN TEACHING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association for Latin Teaching supports the teaching of classical subjects (Latin, Greek, Classical Civilisation and Ancient History) in schools, chiefly by running training conferences for teachers. It also collaborates in producing the Journal of Classics Teaching and has a small collection of ancient artefacts, available for loan for teaching purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 March 1978: Standard registration
- A R L T (Working name)
- THE ASSOCIATION FOR THE REFORM OF LATIN TEACHING (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAURA JANE BEECH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jack Sedgwick | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Isabelle Christina Chasey | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Jennie Elizabeth Willilams | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Wai Lung Chow | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lottie Mortimer | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jack Brooker | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Duncan | Trustee | 30 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ana Isabel Martin Martinez | Trustee | 30 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Johnson | Trustee | 30 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Elizabeth Saunders | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charles Sykes | Trustee | 02 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ana Henderson | Trustee | 03 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jessica Dixon | Trustee | 03 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP LAWRENCE HARPER | Trustee | 26 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR ALISON HENSHAW | Trustee | 22 October 2013 |
|
|||||
HELEN SARAH LOWE | Trustee | 23 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.58k | £6.03k | £20.61k | £17.98k | £16.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.74k | £3.65k | £33.89k | £18.86k | £17.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 29 JULY 1976 AS AMENDED 18 NOVEMBER 1978, 25 JULY 1986, 31 JULY 1987, 28 JULY 1994, 17 AUGUST 1995 AND 29 JULY 2004.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE EFFECTIVE TEACHING IN THE FIRST PLACE OF LATIN LANGUAGE AND LITERATURE, AND IN THE SECOND PLACE OF CLASSICAL GREEK LANGUAGE AND LITERATURE, ANCIENT HISTORY, AND CLASSICAL STUDIES IN GENERAL IN THE SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES OF THE UNITED KINGDOM. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL SERVE TEACHERS OF THESE SUBJECTS BY MEANS OF COURSES, EITHER RESIDENTIAL OR NON-RESIDENTIAL, PUBLICATIONS, AND OTHER SERVICES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 2
Bucklands Court
4 Sydenham Hill
London
London
- Phone:
- 07928404288
- Email:
- arlttreasurer@outlook.com
- Website:
-
arlt.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window