CHITTLEHAMHOLT VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The village hall is used by local inhabitants for various activities such as Lunches, Coffee mornings, Meetings, Garden club, Pilates, Tai Chi, Line Dancing, Dances, Discos, Quizzes, Short Mat Bowls, some church services. The hall has a Alcohol licence used for certain events. The car park and adjacent field is also used for summer fund raising activities. It is a meeting place for the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 08 September 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Spence Seaman | Chair | 20 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert Andrew Maxted Jones | Trustee | 04 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jan Patricia Turner | Trustee | 04 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lizzie Singleton | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Irene Emery | Trustee | 14 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.43k | £11.01k | £2.44k | £6.21k | £49.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.77k | £3.83k | £1.71k | £6.39k | £37.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5TH JUNE 1931
Charitable objects
TO BE USED FOR THE PURPOSE OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION AND MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPEMENT THROUGH TE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS LIBRARY, LECTURES CLASSES RECREATIONS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CHITTLEHAMHOLT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Farriers
Chittlehamholt
UMBERLEIGH
Devon
EX37 9NS
- Phone:
- 01769540605
- Email:
- jspenceseaman@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window