Accounts and annual returns OUR LADY OF GRACE JUNIOR AND INFANTS SCHOOL

Charity Number: 275056
Charity reporting is overdue by 1034 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 669 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 669 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1034 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1034 days
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 28 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required