DIGBY HALL AND LIBRARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MANAGEMENT AND HIRE OF A PUBLIC HALL FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SHERBORNE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 03 March 1978: Standard registration
- DIGBY MEMORIAL HALL AND LIBRARY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHERBORNE TOWN COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £482.19k | £33.42k | £88.73k | £79.47k | £59.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £475.56k | £64.55k | £66.13k | £68.32k | £67.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £20.31k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6TH JANUARY 1978
Charitable objects
A PUBLIC HALL AND PUBLIC LIBRARY FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SHERBORNE IN THE COUNTY OF DORSET AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES, CLASSES, MUSICAL AND THEATRICAL PERFORMANCES, DANCES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SHERBORNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHERBORNE TOWN COUNCIL
THE MANOR HOUSE
NEWLAND
SHERBORNE
DT9 3JL
- Phone:
- 01935812807
- Email:
- info@sherborne-tc.gov.uk
- Website:
-
sherborne-tc.gov.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window