Financial history THE HABERDASHERS' FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 275067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £200.62k £1.12m £1.16m £1.15m £276.03k
Total expenditure £101.19k £856.51k £1.21m £989.43k £1.03m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £232.81k £223.21k £395.84k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £32.81k £0 £200.05k N/A
Income - Investment N/A £840.53k £883.10k £955.22k N/A
Income - Other N/A £49.48k £57.65k £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £32.81k £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £856.51k £1.20m £989.43k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £12.60k £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £31.40k £34.15k £39.47k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £767.26k £1.10m £793.34k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A