THE HABERDASHERS' FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 275067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grants for charitable purposes at the discretion of the trustee, the current focus being on education and the current aim being to support a small number of educational projects in England and Wales.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £276,031
Total expenditure: £1,028,589

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 July 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE HABERDASHERS' DONATIONS TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE HABERDASHERS COMPANY Trustee 19 October 2021
THE ASKE'S TERCENTENARY FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £200.62k £1.12m £1.16m £1.15m £276.03k
Total expenditure £101.19k £856.51k £1.21m £989.43k £1.03m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £232.81k £223.21k £395.84k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £32.81k £0 £200.05k N/A
Income - Investment N/A £840.53k £883.10k £955.22k N/A
Income - Other N/A £49.48k £57.65k £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £32.81k £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £856.51k £1.20m £989.43k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £12.60k £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £31.40k £34.15k £39.47k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £767.26k £1.10m £793.34k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 30 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 30 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 26 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 26 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 28 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 28 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 30 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 30 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 12 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CHARITY COMMISSIONERS SCHEME OF 19TH JUNE 2002.
Charitable objects
OBJECT OF THE FUND IS THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF (A) PUPILS OF THE HABERDASHERS' ASKE'S HATCHAM COLLEGE, (B) EX PUPILS OF THE HABERDASHERS' ASKE'S HATCHAM COLLEGE, AND; (C) THE PARENTS OF CURRENT PUPILS OF THE HABERDASHERS' ASKE'S HATCHAM COLLEGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 24 July 2002 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
THE CLERK
HABERDASHERS HALL
18 WEST SMITHFIELD
LONDON
EC1A 9HQ
Phone:
02072469988