UNITED KINGDOM THALASSAEMIA SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide support and information for all affected by or working with thalassaemia. To coordinate and promote research and help educate patients and health professionals. To educate the wider population, raise awareness and encourage blood screening to identify carriers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 March 1978: Standard registration
- 18 July 2023: Funds received from 1167957 NEPAL THALASSAEMIA SOCIETY
- UKTS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GABRIEL THEOPHANOUS | Chair | 29 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ravi Bathia | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Christodoulou | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Ashkaan Bandoui | Trustee | 29 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Odysoulla Stavrou- Cooper | Trustee | 29 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Jonathan White | Trustee | 29 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Roanna D M Maharaj | Trustee | 29 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anand Singh Ghattaura | Trustee | 29 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zehra Gokturk | Trustee | 29 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £234.35k | £165.16k | £236.04k | £169.76k | £200.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £137.39k | £155.93k | £163.58k | £182.09k | £178.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | £990 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 DEC 1977 AS AMENDED ON 20 JAN 1992 AS AMENDED ON 18 JAN 1994 AS AMENDED ON 30 JAN 1996 AS AMENDED ON 26 JAN 1997 AS AMENDED ON 26 NOV 1998 AS AMENDED ON 24 JAN 1999 AS AMENDED ON 26 MAR 2000 AS AMENDED ON 16 MAR 2003 AS AMENDED ON 07 JUL 2009 AS AMENDED ON 18 SEP 2017 as amended on 02 Dec 2018 as amended on 29 Feb 2020 as amended on 16 May 2021 as amended on 16 May 2021
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM THALASSAEMIA AND RELATED OR SIMILAR DISORDERS AND ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING MEDICAL PRACTITIONERS, IN ALL ASPECTS OF THALASSAEMIA AND RELATED OR SIMILAR DISORDERS IN PARTICULAR BY PROMOTING AND COODINATING RESEARCH INTO ITS CAUSES, TREATMENT, PREVENTION, AND PERMANENT CURE, AND BY DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 The Broadway
Southgate
London
N14 6PH
- Phone:
- 020 8882 0011
- Email:
- info@ukts.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window