GO TEACH PUBLICATIONS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Publication of weekly biblical teaching materials (including visual aids and pupils papers) for use in Sunday Schools and midweek activities. Other visual aids and holiday Bible club materials also produced. Teachers training days arranged on request.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 March 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gareth Warren James | Chair | 18 October 2001 |
|
|||||
Stephen John Whitton | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Ivor Davies | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELERI BRADY | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
TIRZAH LOIS JONES | Trustee | 23 June 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.39k | £125.11k | £170.73k | £157.49k | £166.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £207.44k | £162.91k | £160.57k | £152.99k | £164.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.50k | £5.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22ND DECEMBER 1977
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRITIAN FAITH BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS TO THE COMPANY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING OBJECT THE COMPANY SHALL PRODUCE AND DISTRIBUTE CHRISTIAN LITERATURE AND MATERIALS FOR USE IN SUNDAY SCHOOL LESSONS OR ANY OTHER OCCASION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
GO Teach Publications Ltd
Paradise Mill
Park Lane
MACCLESFIELD
SK11 6TL
- Phone:
- 01625 422279
- Email:
- sales@goteach.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window