ROYAL COLLEGE OF OCCUPATIONAL THERAPISTS

Charity Number: 275119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The college sets the professional and educational standards for occupational therapy. It provides leadership, guidance and information relating to research and development, education, practice and lifelong learning.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Guernsey
  • Isle Of Man
  • Jersey
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 January 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • COLLEGE OF OCCUPATIONAL THERAPISTS LIMITED (Previous name)
  • ROYAL COLLEGE OF OCCUPATIONAL THERAPISTS LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Neil Carnegie Trustee 27 June 2024
None on record
Jacqueline Gordon Trustee 27 June 2024
None on record
Aisling Durkin Trustee 27 June 2024
None on record
Janine Hackett Trustee 27 June 2024
None on record
Dr Sureshkumar Kamalakannan Trustee 27 June 2024
None on record
Dr Anita Atwal Trustee 28 June 2023
None on record
Odeth Richardson Trustee 30 June 2022
None on record
Paul Dunning Trustee 08 November 2021
None on record
Cathryn Elizabeth Holding Trustee 11 June 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £8.57m £8.33m £8.39m £8.50m £9.02m
Total expenditure £8.06m £7.77m £8.71m £9.16m £11.04m
Income from government contracts £211.00k £214.14k £48.16k N/A £18.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £18.71k £15.58k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £8.08m £7.87m £8.15m £8.10m £8.81m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £330.00k £222.00k £178.00k £94.97k £179.00k
Income - Other £158.00k £235.00k £67.00k £281.55k £18.42k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £18.71k £15.58k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.06m £7.77m £8.71m £9.13m £10.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £22.28k £969.00k
Expenditure - Governance £221.00k £0 £0 £63.97k £127.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £22.28k £28.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Own use assets £1.65m £1.61m £1.42m £1.35m £1.55m
Long-term investments £9.19m £7.81m £9.75m £4.34m £9.91m
Other assets £5.20m £5.52m £5.63m £10.03m £5.95m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 -£1.16m £0 £0
Total liabilities £941.00k £802.00k £1.12m £1.32m £1.79m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 29 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 29 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 27 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 27 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 03 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 03 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 30 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 16 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 16 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ROYAL COLLEGE OF
OCCUPATIONAL THERAPISTS
106-114 BOROUGH HIGH STREET
LONDON
SE1 1LB
Phone:
02031414600