THE ARKLETON TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To study new approaches to rural development and education and improve understanding between rural policy makers, academics, practitioners and rural people. This is currently addressed through funding study exchanges.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England
- Kenya
- Uganda
Governance
- 01 March 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Rebecca Allen | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
DR Barnaby Peacocke | Trustee | 07 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Knott | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN PETER EVISON | Trustee | 24 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER MADINE | Trustee | 05 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.00k | £37.24k | £30.63k | £33.13k | £36.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.70k | £23.91k | £18.10k | £5.16k | £4.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED THE 23RD JANUARY 1978 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 19 MARCH 1999, AMENDED 19 AUGUST 1999. AS AMENDED ON 21 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF NEW METHODS AND TECHNIQUES DIRECTED TOWARDS THE ALLEVIATION OF POVERTY IN RURAL AREAS AND THE IMPACT OF ENVIRONMENTAL, ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL FACTORS UPON POVERTY AND OTHER SOCIAL PROBLEMS COMMON TO RURAL AREAS
Area of benefit
WORLD WIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Dower House
Lidstone Road
Enstone
CHIPPING NORTON
Oxfordshire
OX7 4HH
- Phone:
- 07714272541
- Email:
- info@arkletontrust.co.uk
- Website:
-
arkletontrust.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window