THE CHARITY OF JOHN MASCOL (OR CANDLEMAS BREAD)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant currently paid to a single poor person annually.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Somerset
Governance
- 21 March 1978: Standard registration
- 21 June 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5 | £5 | £5 | £5 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 23 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 30 March 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 19 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 17TH OCTOBER 1950 AS AMENDED 19/2/97 BY RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE YEARLY INCOME OF THE SAID CHARITY OF JOHN MASCOL FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF STOGURSEY AND NUMBERING IN ANY ONE YEAR NOT MORE THAN SIX AS THE TRUSTEES SELECT FOR THIS PURPOSE AND IN SUCH WAY AS THEY CONSIDER MOST ADVANTAGEOUS TO THE RECIPIENTS EITHER IN THE SUPPLY OF ARTICLES IN KIND OR IN GRANTS OF MONEY. PROVIDED THAT INCOME SHALL IN NO CASE BE APPLIED IN RELIEF OF RATES, TAXES OR OTHER PUBLIC FUNDS OR SO THAT ANY INDIVIDUAL MAY BECOME ENTITLED TO A PERIODICAL OR RECURRENT BENEFIT THEREFROM.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF STOGURSEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window