STAPLETON/BEGBROOK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is the provision and maintenance of a Community Association for the use of the inhabitants in the designated area of benefit without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, including use for meetings for education and classes, and for other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation with object improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bristol City
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 06 March 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICK TAYLOR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Donna Hamilton | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steve Williams | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Eckersley | Trustee | 14 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Val Grzesiczek | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Edward Iles | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAM WILLIAMS-LOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.72k | £25.95k | £28.43k | £43.58k | £35.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.87k | £23.01k | £34.80k | £43.50k | £35.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.14k | £16.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 DECEMBER 1976 AS AMENDED ON 12 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF STAPLETON/BEGBROOK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.2) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE GOVERNING INSTRUMENT).
Area of benefit
STAPLETON/BEGBROOK
Contact information
- Address:
-
STAPLETON & BEGBROOK COMMUNITY ASSO
FRENCHAY PARK ROAD
BRISTOL
BS16 1HY
- Phone:
- 01179396615
- Email:
- begbrookclub1980@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window