THE COLCHESTER AND DISTRICT CAT RESCUE AND HOMING SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity rehomes cats/kittens in the Colchester area. Each cat has a vet check up, neutering, vaccinating, microchipping. We have a number of cats available for rehoming. Some cats are also looked after at the Sanctuary for the rest of their lives, cats are only put to sleep on veterinary advice. We are entirely dependent on our fundraising, and run a small Charity Shop to help provide income
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 13 March 1978: Standard registration
- COLCHESTER CAT RESCUE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS A CARRINGTON | Chair | 01 September 2000 |
|
|
||||
Linda Coleman | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Milne | Trustee | 31 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £392.18k | £148.08k | £690.22k | £361.61k | £189.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £266.83k | £178.85k | £189.28k | £228.95k | £248.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £36.28k | £60.25k | £7.11k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £513.76k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £87.53k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £3.93k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £24.76k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £60.25k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £513.76k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £178.26k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £11.01k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £932 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £8.70k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6TH FEBRUARY 1978
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A SANCTUARY OR SANCTUARIES FOR THE CARE AND PROTECTION OF CATS AND KITTENS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS MALTREATMENT POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR OTHER SIMILAR CAUSE.
Area of benefit
COLCHESTER AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SANCTUARY
Lyndhurst
Bromley Road
Ardleigh
COLCHESTER
CO7 7SF
- Phone:
- 01206 864284
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window