JOSEPH GLAZER AND EVELYN GLAZER CHARITY FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides financial donations to such deserving causes as the trustees, in their absolute discretion, see fit, eg, sick persons - particularly children - and disabled. All beneficiaries must be charities registered with the charity commission and may include place of religious worship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 March 1978: Standard registration
- 24 August 2011: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
- J AND E R GLAZER CHARITY FUND (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2006 | 05/04/2007 | 05/04/2008 | 05/04/2009 | 05/04/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £800 | £1.19k | £1.39k | £1.51k | £835 | |
|
Total expenditure | £406 | £841 | £1.17k | £1.01k | £565 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2010 | 04 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | 10 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | 12 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 28TH NOVEMBER 1977
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window