LILY DAVIS SPECIAL NEEDS PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Lambeth
Governance
- 10 March 1978: Standard registration
- 25 January 2005: Removed (Does not operate)
- LILY DAVIS SPECIAL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH OCTOBER 1973 AS AMENDED 11TH FEBRUARY 1991 AND 22ND MAY 1995
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MILDLY PHYSICALLY AND/OR MENTALLY DELAYED CHILDREN OR CHILDREN IN OTHER NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES BETWEEN THE AGES OF TWO AND A HALF AND FIVE YEARS LIVING IN THE SOUTHERN PART OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LAMBETH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY AND OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
LAMBETH LB
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window