Financial history THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF MIDWIVES TRUST

Charity number: 275261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £602.78k £887.14k £613.40k £532.02k £501.66k
Total expenditure £910.34k £663.51k £1.40m £450.12k £431.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £31.40k £221.60k £6.49k £2.42k £6.20k
Income - Other trading activities £545.14k £649.75k £593.70k £524.23k £489.67k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £806 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £26.24k £15.79k £13.21k £5.38k £5.79k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £150.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £439.31k £128.27k £952.73k £111.14k £102.39k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £328.95k
Expenditure - Governance £19.00k £4.00k £4.00k £6.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £854.19k £2.66k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.30k
Expenditure - Other £471.02k £535.24k £447.86k £338.99k £0