THE NORTH MYMMS YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth and Community Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 06 September 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Bailie | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Bentall | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr HILARY CARLEN | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.81k | £28.93k | £16.46k | £20.36k | £29.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.15k | £16.76k | £20.37k | £17.32k | £37.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 February 2021 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/09/1976 AS AMENDED ON 08/09/2010 as amended on 05 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF NORTH MYMMS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NORTH MYMMS
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Station Close
Brookmans Park
HATFIELD
Hertfordshire
AL9 7SU
- Phone:
- 01707515650
- Email:
- trustees@nmycc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window