TEIGNMOUTH AND SHALDON MUSEUM AND HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 275290
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2006
Total income: £57,786
Total expenditure: £69,496
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
- Devon
Governance
Registration history:
- 12 April 1980: Standard registration
- 19 March 2007: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 19 March 2007: Funds transferred to 1116204 TEIGN HERITAGE
Organisation type:
Other names:
- T M AND H S (Working name)
- T&SM&HS (Working name)
- TEIGNMOUTH MUSEUM AND HISTORICAL SOCIETY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2004 | 31/10/2005 | 31/10/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.40k | £41.49k | £57.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.76k | £25.37k | £69.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2006 | 06 March 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2006 | 06 March 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2005 | 20 April 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2005 | 22 February 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2004 | 07 March 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2004 | 07 March 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD JANUARY 1980 AS AMENDED 26TH JANUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE GOVERNING DOCUMENT).
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window