Financial history THE PRIORY SCHOOL DORKING EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 275297
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015
Total gross income £1.11k £0 £270 £852 £672
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A