Financial history NANAK DARBAR NORTH LONDON

Charity number: 275315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £144.97k £47.32k £104.49k £140.84k £180.77k
Total expenditure £141.01k £78.79k £75.91k £116.50k £183.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A