Financial history ASHLEWORTH AND HASFIELD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 275325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £1.41k £3.18k £4.81k £4.80k £2.13k
Total expenditure £1.53k £3.03k £5.07k £4.60k £2.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A