THE BRITISH URUGUAYAN SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Society is to advance the education of Britons about Uruguay and of Uruguayans about the United Kingdom, in each case its people, history and culture; the Society promotes lectures and functions in the U.K and makes grants and scholarships available to British schools in Montevideo and other scholastic institutions in Uruguay to promote the objects of the Society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Uruguay
Governance
- 20 March 1978: Standard registration
- 23 December 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.42k | £6.66k | £7.04k | £6.31k | £1.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.68k | £5.10k | £3.15k | £8.95k | £9.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 04 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 18 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 20 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AMENDED 25TH JANUARY 1978
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF BRITONS ABOUT URUGUAY AND OF URUGUAYANS ABOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN EACH CASE INCLUDING ITS PEOPLE, ITS HISTORY AND ITS CULTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window