Financial history CARLTON COLVILLE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 275367
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £26.29k £33.82k £29.90k £28.39k £34.94k
Total expenditure £22.48k £31.22k £34.26k £33.76k £32.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £255 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.71k £7.35k £2.07k £2.05k