DOWNHAM (WESLEY HALLS) COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association's objectives are to operate a Community Centre providing affordable space/premises for hire to the local people in pursuance of social welfare for recreation, education and leisure-time well-being in a safe and welcoming environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,579 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lewisham
Governance
- 23 March 1978: Standard registration
- DOWNHAM COMMUNITY CENTRE - WESLEY HALLS (Working name)
- WELSEY HALLS (DOWNHAM) COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KRISTINA GREEN | Chair | 03 December 1988 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Edwards | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gwen Smith | Trustee | 10 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
VERA WARD | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARGARITA PAUL | Trustee | 18 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
MAXEEN BLACKMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.35k | £56.40k | £70.59k | £101.84k | £143.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.18k | £50.82k | £75.45k | £95.65k | £142.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH SEPTEMBER 1977 AS AMENDED 26TH JANUARY 1978 AND 18TH JANUARY 1979 AS AMENDED 30TH OCTOBER 1991
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE DOWNHAM ESTATE, LEWISHAM AND THE ADJOINING LOCALITIES WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, RACE, NATIONALITY, COLOUR OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITITONS OF LIFE FOR AND BENEFITING THE SAID INHABITANTS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITATS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION. B) TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
DOWNHAM ESTATE,LEWISHAM AND THE ADJOINING LOCALITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Shroffold Road
Bromley
BR1 5PE
- Phone:
- 02086981464
- Email:
- downhamcomcentre@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window