Accounts and annual returns BRIGHTON GREYHOUND OWNERS ASSOCIATION TRUST FOR RETIRED RACING GREYHOUNDS

Charity number: 275378
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 March 2021 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 March 2021 46 days late Download Open in new window