Financial history BRIGHTON GREYHOUND OWNERS ASSOCIATION TRUST FOR RETIRED RACING GREYHOUNDS

Charity number: 275378
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £116.09k £122.03k £117.02k £136.22k £125.08k
Total expenditure £124.01k £114.60k £129.43k £136.62k £121.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A