THE CLOCKMAKERS' CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For such charitable purposes as the Court of Assistants of the Clockmakers' Company may from time to time in their discretion think fit ... principally the provision of bursaries for clockmaker training & other horologically related worthy causes, & support to charitable work in the City of London. "Clockmakers' Collection Fund", supporting the Museum, is also incorporated within the same charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of London
Governance
- 14 March 1978: Standard registration
- 27 June 1995: Removed
- CHARITABLE FUND (Working name)
- COLLECTION FUND (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLOCKMAKERS' COMPANY; POWERS OF TRUSTEE EXERCISED BY COURT OF ASSISTAN | Trustee | 01 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £166.48k | £136.15k | £113.72k | £175.24k | £175.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.58k | £96.61k | £137.27k | £147.97k | £147.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6TH SEPTEMBER 1977
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COURT OF ASSISTANTS OF THE COMPANY OF CLOCKMAKERS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
CITY OF LONDON AND ELSEWHERE
Linked charities
- 14 March 1978 : Standard registration
- 27 June 1995 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Worshipful Company of Clockmakers
1 Throgmorton Avenue
London
EC2N 2BY
- Phone:
- 02079988120
- Email:
- clerk@clockmakers.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window