Governing document MAN GROUP PLC CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 275386

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 JAN 1978 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 09 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED ON 28 JUN 2006 AS AMENDED ON 21 MAR 2013 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 05 JUL 2016 as amended on 17 May 2021
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME TO SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH PURPOSES AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.