ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS MILTON KEYNES AND NORTH BUCKINGHAMSHIRE BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sale of donated goods for:- Animal welfare, neutering, rehoming, Other fundraising activities for the above
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 05 April 1978: Standard registration
- MILTON KEYNES & NORTH BUCKS RSPCA (Working name)
- RSPCA MILTON KEYNES AND NORTH BUCKINGHAMSHIRE BRANCH (Working name)
- RSPCA MILTON KEYNES AND NORTH BUCKINGHAMSHIRE BRANCH (Previous name)
- RSPCA NORTH BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND MILTON KEYNES BRANCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amy Bull | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Alison Barclay | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Lucy Tayler | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
SALLY JESSOP | Trustee | 03 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £344.16k | £294.90k | £282.24k | £381.31k | £361.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £279.15k | £219.55k | £195.85k | £317.07k | £392.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £76.97k | £52.30k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RSPCA BRANCH RULES EFFECTIVE 18 FEBRUARY 2009.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BRANCH ARE TO PROMOTE THE WORK AND OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY [ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS (219099)], WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE AREA OF THE BRANCH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POLICIES OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NORTH BUCKINGHAMSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RSPCA
63 High Street
NEWPORT PAGNELL
Buckinghamshire
MK16 8AT
- Phone:
- 01908 611179
- Email:
- branch@mkrspca.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window