HORSE RESCUE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Horse Rescue Fund aims to prevent and relieve cruelty to horses, ponies and donkeys, to protect them from unnecessary suffering and to advance the education of the public in their proper care and treatment. To this end we rescue any neglected or badly treated equines, restore them to full health and carry out all necessary rehabilitation to enable us to place them on loan in approved homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 30 May 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Crook | Chair | 12 March 2001 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Yale | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Corinne Janet Bullock | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.73k | £265.59k | £192.74k | £77.96k | £90.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £205.11k | £83.98k | £89.54k | £172.16k | £117.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 14TH FEBRUARY 1978 AS AMENDED 3RD FEBRUARY 1993 AND 9TH SEPTEMBER 2000.
Charitable objects
(1)TO PREVENT AND RELIEVE CRUELTY TO HORSES (WHICH EXPRESSION SHALL INCLUDE PONIES, MULES AND DONKEYS) TO PROTECT THEM FROM UNNECESSARY SUFFERING AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THEIR PROPER CARE AND TREATMENT. (2) TO AMELIORATE THE PAIN AND SUFFERING OF HORSES WHICH ARE FOR ANY REASON UNFIT FOR WORK OR IN NEED OF CARE BY THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF A HOME OF REST OR HOMES OF REST, STABLING AND GRAZING, OR BY PROVISION OF SUITABLE WORK UNDER THE SUPERVISION OF THE SOCIETY OR BY ARRANGING FOR THEIR PAINLESS DESTRUCTION OR BY ANY COMBINATION OF SUCH MEANS AS AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodstock Farm
Post Office Road
Toft Monks
BECCLES
NR34 0EH
- Phone:
- 01502 679191
- Email:
- info@horserescuefund.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window