THE BUCKINGHAM SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise additional funds for the school through organising various activities and also to provide exciting events and resources for the children of Buckingham Primary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 20 April 1978: Standard registration
- BUCKINGHAM PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mousumi Bhola | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Colette Walsh | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Revathi Nair | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Longdon-Hughes | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Adams | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Harman | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Crean | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malgorzata Wania | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah English | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Kerry Keene | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aurelia White | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.20k | £14.15k | £9.66k | £2.47k | £986 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.96k | £9.71k | £15.52k | £5.08k | £563 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 694 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 694 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 March 2021 | 268 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH APRIL 1977 AS AMENDED 11TH OCTOBER 1978
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BUCKINGHAM PRIMARY SCHOOL
BUCKINGHAM ROAD
HAMPTON
TW12 3LT
- Phone:
- 02089412548
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window