THE SUFFOLK REGIMENT MUSEUM AND TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Runs and maintains the Suffolk and Cambridgeshire Regiment Museum, a Suffolk Regiment display in Moyse's Hall, the Cambridgeshire Regiment display at IWM Duxford and the reserve collections for The Suffolk and Cambridgeshire Regiments Museum .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £12,860 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
- Suffolk
Governance
- 09 June 1978: Standard registration
- 28 November 2022: Funds received from 1087992 SUFFOLK REGIMENT ASSOCIATION UNITED CHARITY
- SUFFOLK REGIMENT MUSEUM FUND (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lieutenant Colonel Mark Hubert Wenham | Chair | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Captain David Granfield | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert Craig Adam | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Major Paul Joseph Machnicki | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Major Gregory Owen Luton | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Mark Knight MBE DL | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Lt Col David Sean Denson | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|||||
LT COL ANTHONY DOUGLAS SLATER | Trustee | 10 June 2008 |
|
|||||
BRIGADIER ANTHONY JOHN KENNION CALDER OBE DL | Trustee | 12 August 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.30k | £39.58k | £59.32k | £63.44k | £61.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.76k | £42.72k | £50.65k | £70.44k | £88.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £6.31k | N/A | £12.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 05 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 05 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28TH DECEMBER 1977 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 19 JANUARY 1981, SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23 FEBRUARY 2005 AND SCHEME 18 AUGUST 2010.
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND MEMBERS OF THE REGIMENT IN THE HISTORY AND MILITARY ACCOMPLISHMENTS OF THE REGIMENT AND TO PROMOTE MILITARY EFFICIENCY AND ENCOURAGE RECRUITMENT BY PUBLIC EXHIBITION OF THE COLLECTION IN A MUSEUM OR MUSEUMS OR SUCH OTHER PUBLIC PLACES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE, AND TO CONSERVE, RESTORE, REPAIR, RECONSTRUCT AND PRESERVE OBJECTS IN THE COLLECTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Keep
Gibraltar Barracks
Out Risbygate
BURY ST EDMUNDS
Suffolk
IP33 3RN
- Phone:
- 01284749317
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window