LAMBETH CARING HOUSES TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 19 April 1978: Standard registration
- 01 September 1992: Removed (Exempt charity)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH MARCH 1978 AS AMENDED 20TH APRIL 1978 AND 22ND JUNE 1978
Charitable objects
(A) THE TRUST IS ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES ONLY. (B) IN PARTICULAR THE TRUST IS ESTABLISHED TO PROVIDE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF HOMELESS PERSONS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LAMBETH BY THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS, THE FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
LAMBETH LB
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.