THE THIRD WORLD FOUNDATION FOR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC STUDIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to provide relief from poverty, sickness and advance education among inhabitants of the developing countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Croydon
Governance
- 13 March 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NASIM SALEEMI | Trustee | 25 November 2003 |
|
|
||||
Dr IRFAN MIAN | Trustee | 14 August 1995 |
|
|
||||
Robina Hasan | Trustee | 14 August 1995 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.67k | £6.39k | £6.37k | £1.70k | £11.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.47k | £2.22k | £1.73k | £11.91k | £5.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13TH MARCH 1978
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONG INHABITANTS OF THE WORLD COUNTRIES OR ANY OF THEM THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A PROGRAMME OF RESEARCH AND INVESTIGATION THE RESULTS OF WHICH WILL BE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL AND ORGANISATIONS CONCERNED WITH IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN THIRD WORLD COUNTRIES IN PARTICULAR.
Area of benefit
THIRD WORLD COUNTRIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 69
Charlbert Court
Charlbert Street
LONDON
NW8 7DB
- Phone:
- 02086554211
- Email:
- mihasan0@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window