THE APOLLO SWIMMING CLUB FOR THE PHYSICALLY DISABLED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity runs weekly swimming sessions for our members in Sherborne and Yeovil. In addition to the swimming, there is a strong social element to our charity. We have regular social evenings and fundraising events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 19 June 1978: Standard registration
- APOLLO SWIMMING CLUB (Working name)
- THE APOLLO SWIMMING CLUB (Previous name)
- THE APOLLO SWIMMING CLUB FOR THE PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angus John MacLean | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Etive Warr | Trustee | 21 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Suzanne Masterson | Trustee | 13 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE ELIZABETH DRAKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN DIANE ALLEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA PATRICIA DRAKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH LOUISE HULL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Graeme Tate | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.23k | £2.34k | £2.90k | £8.56k | £9.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.34k | £3.73k | £4.46k | £8.67k | £9.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 06/05/1978 AS AMENDED ON 21/02/1994 AS AMENDED ON 20/02/1995 AS AMENDED ON 19/02/2007 AS AMENDED ON 17/02/2014
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE, PROMOTE AND DEVELOP SWIMMING AND SAILING FOR THE PHYSICAL REHABILITATION OF THE DISABLED OF YEOVIL AND DISTRICT
Area of benefit
YEOVIL AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 South View
West Camel Road
Queen Camel
YEOVIL
Somerset
BA22 7ND
- Phone:
- 01935 479992
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window