DARUL AMAAN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running a mosque in south-west London
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 20 February 1981: Standard registration
- COLLIERS WOOD MOSQUE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shaful KHAN | Trustee | 18 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rafiqul Haider | Trustee | 18 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
KAMRAN HUDA | Trustee | 18 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shamim AHMED | Trustee | 18 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Syed Almas ALI | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
SYED SAJID UDDIN | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abdus Subhan | Trustee | 05 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED TAZUL ISLAM | Trustee | 12 March 1999 |
|
|
||||
JALAL UDDIN AHMED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NAZRUL ISLAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £321.28k | £149.39k | £146.24k | £174.53k | £239.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.87k | £82.09k | £121.61k | £116.71k | £71.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 December 2023 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 December 2023 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3RD MARCH 1978
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE FAITH OF ISLAM AND ISLAMIC CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS, AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. SEE TRUST DEED FOR FURTHER DETAILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 20 February 1981 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Merton High Street
London
SW19 1DH
- Phone:
- 02085435687
- Email:
- darulamaantrus54@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window