Governing document Friends of Kingsbridge Community College
Charity Number: 275587

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 SEPTEMBER 1977 AS AMENDED 15 OCTOBER 1990, 26 SEPTEMBER 1991 AND 19 SEPTEMBER 2001. as amended on 11 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE STUDENTS AT THE SCHOOL AND COMMUNITY COLLEGE BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR THE STUDENTS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE KINGSBRIDGE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.