Accounts and annual returns THE RED SEA TEAM INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 275600
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 16 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 16 January 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 23 January 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 28 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 28 January 2016 On Time