THE RED SEA TEAM INTERNATIONAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Co-ordinating financial, practical and personnel matters between national offices.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Djibouti
- Mali
- Pakistan
Governance
- 06 June 1978: Standard registration
- 05 February 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 05 February 2019: Funds transferred to 1174386 REACHACROSS INTERNATIONAL
- REACHACROSS INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 30/06/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.37k | £52.31k | £57.68k | £225.50k | £134.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.28k | £48.35k | £50.90k | £154.94k | £156.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 16 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | 16 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 10 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 10 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 23 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 23 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 28 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 28 January 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10TH OCTOBER 1977
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE TRUSTS AND FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES DESINGED FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE AND UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE NAMELY:- FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF THE PREACHING OF THE GOSPEL OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AMONG MUSLIMS IN MANNER AFORESAID IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AND PARTICULARLY IN THE RED SEA AREA AND THE UNITED KINGDOM. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE GOVERNING INSTRUMENT).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window