Financial history ALTON COMMUNITY CARE

Charity number: 275617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £37.87k £33.34k £33.43k £38.78k £27.35k
Total expenditure £41.85k £23.68k £32.27k £30.71k £29.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A