R A VESTEY CHARITABLE TRUST FOR MAINTENANCE OF GREAT THURLOW CHURCH

Charity Number: 275642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The maintenance, repair and preservation of All Saints Church, Great Thurlow, Suffolk.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £809
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 May 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GEORGE MOUBRAY WILLIAM VESTEY Trustee
SUFFOLK COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ROBIN JOHN HENRY VESTEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £695 £612 £564 £626 £809
Total expenditure £147 £462 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 02 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 03 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 KING'S ARMS YARD
LONDON
EC2R 7AF
Phone:
02076016200
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available