Trustees WATCHET MARKET HOUSE MUSEUM SOCIETY
Charity number: 275645

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES NICHOLAS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Jane Catherine Armstrong | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Brake | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Emilie Long | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
LORETTA ANNE WHETLOR | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY AMERY | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
MRS MOLLY QUINT | Trustee | 22 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN UPSTONE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER HOWARD MURPHY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HUGH AMERY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS GAY CHILCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.